THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:56:25 AM
Noel De Tilly, Lyne
CPSO#:
62846
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St. Michael’s Hospital
Health Records Department
416-864-6060 ext. 2169
Fax: 416-864-5831
Date Received: 27 Apr 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:15 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 2023 |