THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:37:10 AM
Fam, Alice Poh Nyuk
CPSO#:
62586
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: (705) 759-3682
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:08 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALICE POH NYUK FAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1991 |