THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:23:49 PM
Stewart, Martin Christopher
CPSO#:
62187
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 874-3527
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:04 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN CHRISTOPHER STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1991 |