skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/12/22 17:05:24 PM

Kay, John David

CPSO#: 60917

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Wortley Road
Suite 209
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 667-2221
Fax: (519) 667-2001 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ambulatory Care
Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Hosp
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerrie Kay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kay ( CPSO# 60917 )
Dr. A. Gerrie ( CPSO# 62427 )

Business Address:
Core Family Health
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Business Address:
209 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 667-2221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990