THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:21:56 AM
Fritz, Daniel Robert
CPSO#:
60812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2215
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT FRITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRITZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1990 |