THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:28:53 AM
Ross, Joan Elizabeth
CPSO#:
60372
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bennett, Joan Elizabeth (used until: 04 Jun 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1098 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7S1P1
Phone: (519) 337-9999
Fax: (519) 541-0873
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:08 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1988 |