skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/09/21 13:30:11 PM

Gray, Bruce Garstang

CPSO#: 58202

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5792
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Bruce Garstang Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5792

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRUCE GARSTANG GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988