THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:52:24 AM
Pandhi, Hemant Manilal
CPSO#:
57959
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Apr 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Gujarat University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 678-7324
Fax: (905) 678-7145
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 1987 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 10 Jan 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2001 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 10 Apr 2001 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2001 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Apr 2001
Summary:
On April 2, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pandhi s guilty plea and found him guilty of:
(1) engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he;
(i) failed to advise the College that there were disciplinary actions pending against him by the licensing authority in the State of New York;
(ii) advised the College that he had not entered into an agreement with a licensing authority in the face of potential disciplinary action by the authority, when this was not a true or accurate statement.
(2) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found Dr. Pandhi committed an act of professional misconduct;
(3) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of professional misconduct or a similar finding against Dr. Pandhi.
The Committee directed the following penalty:
(1) recorded reprimand;
(2) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of three months, commencing January 10, 2001 until April 10, 2001;
(3) the Registrar is directed to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.Pandhi s certificate of registration:
(a) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be limited to general practice pending an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to practice emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment.
(4) that Dr. Pandhi pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000, to be paid no later than June 30, 2001;
(5) the Registrar is directed to register the result of any successful appeal by Dr. Pandhi of the Determination and Order of the State Board for Professional Medical Conduct in the State of New York in the matter of Hemant Pandhi, M.D. made September 22, 2000.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 02, 2001