THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:24:41 AM
Sider, Douglas Michael
CPSO#:
54982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
14 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Public Health Ontario
300-480 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V2
Date Received: 11 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2022 |