skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/12/22 10:31:47 AM

Rossi, Christine Marie

CPSO#: 51523

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-5612
Fax: (705) 759-7460 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. S. Stevenson ( CPSO# 72103 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Booth ( CPSO# 79391 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Rebelo ( CPSO# 100442)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. K. Babik ( CPSO# 105663)
Dr. T. Oliver ( CPSO# 105931)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6


Corporation Name: C.M. Rossi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE ROSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1984