THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:00:19 AM
Oczkowski, Wieslaw Jan
CPSO#:
51298
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: McMaster University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical record requests, former patients should contact the hospital where they were treated by Dr. Oczkowski.
1) Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Hospital Records Department
Phone: 905-521-2100
2) St. Joseph’s Healthcare System
Health Records Department
Phone: 905-522-1155
Note: Any paper medical records prior to 2000 have been destroyed.
Date Received: 05 Dec 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |