skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/08/22 21:30:23 PM

Bethune, Cheri Elsie Heather

CPSO#: 50148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 258-2818
Fax: (705) 258-2828 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

233 Eighth St.
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: 7052724200
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert T. Miller and Dr. Cheri E.H. Bethune Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Miller ( CPSO# 25948 )
Dr. C. Bethune ( CPSO# 50148 )

Business Address:
233 8th Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 272-4200

Business Address:
507 8th Avenue
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0

Business Address:
58A Anson Drive A
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-2828

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:19 Feb 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERI ELSIE HEATHER BETHUNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETHUNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015