THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:39:28 AM
Roy, Marie Lessard
CPSO#:
32873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marie L. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may write to Dr. Papdopoulos at One Medical Place, 302-20 Wynford Drive, Toronto, ON, M3C 1J4
Phone: 416-445-9673
Fax: 416-445-9388
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |