skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 21:29:39 PM

Kordish, Paul Louis

CPSO#: 32308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K W Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone: (519) 748-2327
Fax: (519) 748-2576 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Alpen Grove
Heidelberg ON  N0B 2M1
Canada
Phone: (519) 699-4017
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

751 Victoria St. South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 745-2273
Fax: (519) 745-1871
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. L. Kordish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kordish ( CPSO# 32308 )

Business Address:
KW Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Suite 9
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone Number: (519) 748-2327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL LOUIS KORDISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDISH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985