THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:18:38 AM
Donald, Shirley Fern
CPSO#:
32301
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S.F. Donald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital, 170 Colborne Street West, Orillia, ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 15 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2015 |