THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:35:44 AM
Baimel, Evelyne
CPSO#:
32281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bensmihen-Baimel, Evelyne (used until: 27 Mar 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Evelyne Baimel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVELYNE BAIMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIMEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1981 |