skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 7:19:06 AM

Baxter, Alan Dawson

CPSO#: 32262

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Apr 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018