skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 13:51:56 PM

Ligate, Loys Jane

CPSO#: 32260

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Dec 2018
EXPIRY DATE
18 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L.J. Ligate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Grand Valley Institute for Women 1575 Homer Watson Blvd Kitchener ON N2P 2C5 Or 80 Waterloo Ave Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 2018