THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:19:09 PM
Way, Roland Clifton Kean
CPSO#:
32249
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Mar 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Cambridge Cardiac Centre
150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 6V6
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |