skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 19:19:50 PM

Haust, Maria Daria

CPSO#: 32219

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Oct 1994

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 
The University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London, Ontario
N6A 5A5
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013


Instructions/Address:

The University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:10 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1957
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 03 May 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2013