THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/03/24 23:01:17 PM
Aylmer, Anne Patricia
CPSO#:
32190
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
06 Dec 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Nov 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 31 Dec 1980
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2002 to 06 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Dec 2002 |