skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 9:11:44 AM

Lee-Ng, Marie Madeleine

CPSO#: 32095

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lee Chong Ken, Marie Madeleine (used until: 23 Mar 1981 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, Creole, English, French, Hakka, Mandarin

Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact:

DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON 
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com 
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013