THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:08:57 PM
Keating, Sarah Jane
CPSO#:
32061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lazier, Sarah Jane (used until: 15 Aug 1984 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
.
Toronto ON M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1986 |