THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:11:12 AM
Bloomberg, Gary Bernard
CPSO#:
32045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Metro Cardiology
507-5050 Kingsway
Burnaby BC V5H 4C2
Phone: (604) 439-1277
Fax: (604) 439-1276
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY BERNARD BLOOMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOMBERG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1980 |