skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 4:26:01 AM

Hafez, Shahira Osman

CPSO#: 32040

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Oct 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahira Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Trillium Health Centre
150 Sherway Dr
Toronto, ON  M9C 1A5

Phone: 905-848-7533
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018