THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:38:41 AM
Marien, Leslie Robert
CPSO#:
32027
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:P.O Box 40052
Springbrook P.O
Orangeville ON L9W 0A7
Date Received: 10 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Apr 1992
Summary:
In April 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Marien guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Marien was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Marien s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of two months, with the suspension itself to be suspended provided that the following conditions were fulfilled:
(i) Dr. Marien was to consult with the Director of the Education Department of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario regarding the appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill and judgment in respect of the practice of medicine.
(ii) As part of this assessment, Dr. Marien was to be referred by the Director of the Education Department of the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program.
(iii) Dr. Marien was to consent to the release by the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program of any information considered appropriate by the Director of Education of the College prior to the assessment taking place.
(iv) Dr. Marien was to attend the McMaster Physician Review Program and was to cooperate in every respect with the assessment provided by the Program.
(v) Dr. Marien was to consent to the release by the McMaster Physician Review Program to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of any information with respect to the assessment and the result of the assessment as might be considered necessary by the Director of the Education Department of the College.
(vi) Dr. Marien was to complete any period of supervision and any program of upgrading which might be recommended by the Physician Review Program successfully and to the satisfaction of the Registrar, and was to submit himself to such further reassessment or reassessments as might from time to time be recommended by the Physician Review Program, and would complete any training, upgrading or period of supervision recommended by the Physician Review Program from time to time on the occasion of any re-assessment or re-assessments which might be recommended.
(vii) Dr. Marien was to pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the McMaster Physician Review Program as and when invoiced in an amount to be prescribed by the Registrar of the College, said amount not to exceed $8000.00.
(viii) In the event of the Doctor's failing, in the judgment of the Registrar, to comply with any of these terms and conditions, the full suspension of licence hereinbefore mentioned would come into effect.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Apr 1992