THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:45:30 PM
Suke, Ralph
CPSO#:
32013
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Suk, Ralph (used until: 18 Jun 1984 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Suke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RR2
319055 Grey Road 1
Kemble ON N0H 1S0
Tel: 1-519-371-8789
Date Received: 22 Mar 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RALPH SUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1980 |