skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 7:43:06 AM

Whitby, Peter Lyndall

CPSO#: 31940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2H 0E2
Phone: (519) 904-0656
Fax: (519) 904-0658 Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER LYNDALL WHITBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985