skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/22 3:51:28 AM

Ashbourne, John Fraser

CPSO#: 31866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Room
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Highland Health Services
6 McPherson Street
P O Box 30
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Ashbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 30763 )
Dr. J. Ashbourne ( CPSO# 31866 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN FRASER ASHBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History