skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/07/20 21:01:16 PM

Kirsh, Brian Sheldon

CPSO#: 31826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
499 Oriole Parkway
Toronto ON  M5P 2H9
Phone: 437-244-2345 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brian S. Kirsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kirsh ( CPSO# 31826 )

Business Address:
Suite 270
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 922-8429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN SHELDON KIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2009