THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:48:14 AM
Warnes, Hector
CPSO#:
31822
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
14 Dec 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian, Spanish
Education: National University of Tucuman, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1991 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 14 Dec 1992 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 1991
Summary:
In May 1991, Dr. Warnes pleaded guilty to the charges in the Notice of Hearing. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and in September 1991 found Dr. Warnes guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Warnes' licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-12-14
Hearing Date(s): 23 May 1991