THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:57:34 AM
Howard, Craig Richard
CPSO#:
31744
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Feb 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Feb 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905-330-4599
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRAIG RICHARD HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Feb 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 1984 |