THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:05:44 PM
Severs, Stanley Robert Frederick
CPSO#:
31738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th Street East
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Severs, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STANLEY ROBERT FREDERICK SEVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEVERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2022 |