THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:43:54 PM
Varma, Gokuldas Ravi
CPSO#:
31729
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Italian, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Rome, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may send medical record requests to the address above or call the medical centre at 416-657-1321
1801 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M6E 2H8
Date Received: 01 Apr 2019
Instructions/Address:1801 Eglinton Avenue, Toronto, ON M6E 2H8
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gokuldas Ravi Varma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 13, 2017:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Varma engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of general medicine. As a result of the investigation:
- Dr. Varma will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
- Dr. Varma’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.