THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:03:14 AM
Spindler, Eric Eugene
CPSO#:
31726
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Health Records Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 12 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Nov 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2018 |