THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:53:47 AM
Osmun, William Edward
CPSO#:
31652
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W. E. Osmun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2020 |