skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/12/21 19:43:54 PM

Cohen, Mark David

CPSO#: 31599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2045 finch avenue w
Toronto ON  M3N1N9
Phone: 416-745-0811 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1145 albion road
Toronto ON  M9V4J7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

429 walmer road
Toronto ON  M5P2X9
Canada
Phone: 416-9676949
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5935 bathurst street
Toronto ON  M2R1Y8
Canada
Phone: 416-2234050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mark Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Mark Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cohen ( CPSO# 31599 )

Business Address:
33 Foursome Cres
North York ON  M2P 1W1
Phone Number: 6474007656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980