skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 9:36:48 AM

Burke, Robert Clyve

CPSO#: 31491

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert C. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burke ( CPSO# 31491 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suite 517
3800 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3P7
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology and Head and Neck Surgery
600 University Ave., 4th Floor, Room 413
Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 30 May 2022


Instructions/Address:

Department of Otolaryngology and Head and Neck Surgery
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 401 , 600 University Ave.
Toronto, ON, M5G 1X5
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2022