THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:17:31 PM
Simms, Richard James
CPSO#:
31486
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: 7054355131
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:12 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2015 |