skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/22 0:58:41 AM

Laperriere, John Normand Paul

CPSO#: 31398

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
Suite 7-513
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416-946-6522
Fax: 476-946-2111 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Normand Laperriere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN NORMAND PAUL LAPERRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPERRIERE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985