skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 9:56:28 AM

Hay, William John

CPSO#: 31330

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Hawkesbury General Hospital, Hawkesbury, Ontario
The Prescott and Russell Residence, Hawkssbury, Ontario
Curtis Memorial  Hospital, St Anthony, NL
Date Received: 16 Jun 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2022