THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:17:15 PM
Mueller, Elizabeth Katharina
CPSO#:
31281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jan 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Stirling MacGregor Dr
Cambridge ON N1S 5B7
Phone: (519) 622 3434 Ext. 261
Fax: (519) 622 7592
Electoral District: 03
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to request copies of their medical records can write to the address provided
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON N1S 2N3
Date Received: 16 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KATHARINA MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 1998 |