THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:37:13 AM
Beatty, Myles Franklin
CPSO#:
31270
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Beatty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2012
Corporation Name: Myles Beatty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:11 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Myles Franklin Beatty to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 1, 2021:
A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint received by the College that raised concerns about Dr. Beatty’s past obstetrics and gynecology practice. Subsequently, Dr. Beatty resigned from the College. Dr. Beatty has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)