skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/10/21 18:10:42 PM

Chong, John Peter

CPSO#: 31249

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Suite 201
565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: (905) 574-1119 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Musicians' Clinic of Canada
340-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 966-8742
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chong ( CPSO# 31249 )

Business Address:
Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
201 - 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 574-5444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective:03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Jul 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Jul 2021 Active
 As from July 8, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Peter Chong in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. JOHN PETER CHONG
("Dr. Chong")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
								
A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

 "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Chong, certificate of registration number 31249, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers 104586 and 7216197 (the "Investigations") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my occupational medicine practice.  In resolution of the Investigation, I entered into an Undertaking dated April 2, 2019.

(4)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that this Undertaking supercedes and replaces the April 2, 2019 Undertaking.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately. 

(6)	Practice Restrictions

(a)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall provide only short-term psychotherapy, to a maximum of 12 sessions per patient;

(b)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall ensure that each of my patients has a primary care provider and shall not initiate or continue a treating relationship with any patient until I receive confirmation that the patient has a primary care provider;

(c)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall provide regular consultation reports to the patient's primary care provider, and will report any and all medications prescribed to the patient's primary care provider.

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(13)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chong engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his occupational medicine practice.  As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Chong shall provide only short-term psychotherapy, to a maximum of 12 sessions per patient.

Dr. Chong shall ensure that all of his patients have primary care providers and shall not initiate or continue a treating relationship with any patient until he receives confirmation that the patient has a primary care provider.

Dr. Chong shall provide regular consultation reports to the patient's primary care provider, and shall report any and all medications prescribed to the patient's primary care provider.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.




Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Peter Chong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chong engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his occupational medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Chong shall provide only short-term psychotherapy, to a maximum of 12 sessions per patient.

Dr. Chong shall ensure that all of his patients have primary care providers and shall not initiate or continue a treating relationship with any patient until he receives confirmation that the patient has a primary care provider.

Dr. Chong shall provide regular consultation reports to the patient's primary care provider, and shall report any and all medications prescribed to the patient's primary care provider.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 2, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 2, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On November 25, 2016 at the Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. John Peter Chong in respect of an incident that took place in July 2009.