skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 17:55:16 PM

Chang, Lily

CPSO#: 31237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Holly St
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone: 14167923151 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3585 Keele St
York diagnostic Endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: 416 398 2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3585 Keele St
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: 416 398 2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3585 Keele St
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: 416 398 2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave E
North Scarborough Endoscopy clinic
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 416 293 9402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave E
North Scarborough Endoscopy clinic
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 4162939402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave E
North Scarborough Endoscopy clinic
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 14162939402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave E
North Scarborough Endoscopy clinic
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 14162939402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave E
North Scarborough Endoscopy Clinic
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 4162939402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

40 Holly St
Holly Endoscopy Clinic
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: 416 486 5088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

302-1315 Finch Ave W
Promed Endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: 416 634 0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1315 Finch Ave W
Promed Endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: 416 634 0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

109-2101 Brimley Rd
Uptown eye Specialists
Scarborough ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: 416 292 0332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

201-1635 Lawrence Ave W
Downsview endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M6L 3C9
Canada
Phone: 416 630 7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

308-2175 Sheppard Ave E
Don Valley Endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M2J 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 638 5889
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5734 Yonge St
Dynamic Endoscopy Clinic
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416 222 5509
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

450-5 Fairview Mall Dr
Toronto GI Clinic
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Canada
Phone: 416 322 7517
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

890 Yonge St
la fontaine source de jeunesse cos
Toronto ON  M4W 3P4
Canada
Phone: 416 760 3234
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Dr
Polyclinic
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416 222 6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

700 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Immune Diagnostic Centre
North York ON  M6A 3B4
Canada
Phone: 416 812 2113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

230-340 College St
Kensington Health Clinic
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416 928 9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lily Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chang ( CPSO# 31237 )

Business Address:
Suite 3
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 9, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 27, 2017, Humber River Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5. of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act and s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Lily Chang has voluntarily agreed not to practice at Humber River Hospital during the course of an investigation by Humber River Hospital into Dr. Chang’s anesthesia practice.

On July 5, 2018, Humber River Hospital notified the College that Dr. Chang did not submit an Application for Reappointment for the 2018-2019 reappointment year and consequently her privileges terminated.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILY CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1979

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 19, 2020, Dr. Lily Chang has completed the elements of the Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)