THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:22:20 AM
Blechschmidt, Donald Rolf
CPSO#:
31235
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Nov 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. D. Blechschmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 104
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton, ON
L6X 0H9
Date Received: 24 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2020 |