THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:31:15 AM
Kirby, Thomas James
CPSO#:
31160
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1994 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |