THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:27:59 AM
Joshi, Sushma
CPSO#:
31144
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 673-6211
Fax: (905) 673-9520
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSHMA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1979 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 29 Feb 2004 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jan 2004
Summary:
On January 29, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joshi committed an act of professional misconduct that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional in that she paid a patient a sum of money that the patient claimed was owing to her by Dr. Joshi(s husband, who is also a physician, and the patient withdrew the complaint against Dr. Joshi(s husband.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) that the Registrar suspend Dr. Joshi(s certificate of registration commencing January 30, 2004, for a period of three months, two months of which will be suspended if, within twelve months, Dr. Joshi successfully completes the College ethics course;
2) that Dr. Joshi attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
3) that Dr. Joshi pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00; and
4) that the results of the proceedings to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 29, 2004