THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:34:41 AM
Neimanis, Ieva Marija
CPSO#:
31135
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Latvian
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: I.M. Neimanis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:801 Mohawk Road West
Suite 204
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2017 |