THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:17:58 AM
Davis, Kathleen Anne
CPSO#:
31122
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kathleen A. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone Number: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
Date Received: 02 Jan 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |